GA HB855 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 10 of Chapter 21 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Driver's Education Commission, so as to increase the additional penalty to be assessed for violation of traffic laws and ordinances; to repeal an automatic sunset date for the imposition of such fees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Driver's Education Commission; additional penalty to be assessed for violation of traffic laws and ordinances; increase
Sponsors
Rep. John Deffenbaugh [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] |
Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Hopper |