GA HB855 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 70 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to service delivery by counties and municipalities, so as to revise the procedures for the implementation of a local government service delivery strategy; to provide for conditions, limitation, and sanctions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Counties and municipalities; implementation of local government service delivery strategy; revise procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-27 | House | House Hopper |