GA HB854 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 7 of Chapter 14 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to foreclosure, so as to prohibit nonjudicial foreclosures on mortgages on real estate when the mortgagor is 65 years of age or older or an adult for whom a guardian or conservator has been appointed; to provide for legislative intent; to revise the definition of the term 'debtor' for certain purposes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; nonjudicial foreclosure on mortgages on real estate when the mortgagor is 65 years of age or older or an adult for whom a guardian or conservator has been appointed; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Bell [D] | Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Edna Jackson [D] | Rep. Miriam Paris [D] |
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-08 | House | House Hopper |
2023-11-22 | House | House Prefiled |