GA HB850 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 29 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to court proceedings involving guardian and ward, so as to provide for criminal background checks for persons seeking to become a guardian or conservator; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guardian and ward; criminal background checks for persons seeking to become a guardian; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - House - House Vote #516 - Passage (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-09 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-02 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-01 | House First Readers |