GA HB85 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding insurance, so as to require health benefit policy coverage for biomarker testing if supported by medical and scientific evidence; to provide for definitions; to provide for processes to request exceptions or appeal adverse determinations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; require health benefit policy coverage for biomarker testing if supported by medical and scientific evidence
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Teddy Reese [D] |
Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #225 (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #39 (Y: 172 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #39 (Y: 172 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-02 | Act 232 | |
2023-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-26 | House | House Hopper |