GA HB85 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-5-271 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to table of values for conservation use value of forest land, so as to revise the methodology used to establish forest land fair market value; to provide for a sales data bank; to provide for publication; to provide for appeals; to provide for an administrative fee; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem tax; methodology used to establish forest land fair market value; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #820 (Y: 169 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #806 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #664 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #668 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #157 (Y: 162 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-01 Effective Date
2018-05-02 Act 296
2018-05-02HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-06HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-23SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-21SenateSenate Recommitted
2018-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/85
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/163122.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166617.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167273.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/174669.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/177372.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178008.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178951.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14970
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16136
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16268

Bill Comments

feedback