GA HB849 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to income tax, so as to provide for reporting of federal partnership adjustments; to provide for Georgia partnership and pass-through entity adjustments and assessments and related appeals; to revise the provisions relating to the reporting of other federal adjustments; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; reporting of federal partnership adjustments; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. John Carson [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #750 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #558 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #694 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Vote #558 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 381 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House Hopper |