GA HB845 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Young Harris; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and property of the city; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for severability; to provide a specific repealer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Young Harris, City of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #603 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 379 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House Hopper |