GA HB845 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to justification and excuse, so as to provide for immunity from criminal liability for possession of certain materials or images under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; immunity from criminal liability for possession of certain materials or images under certain circumstances; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-26 | House | House Hopper |