GA HB841 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Effective Date 2022-02-15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Effective Date 2022-02-15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of East Cobb; to provide a charter; to provide for prior ordinances and rules, pending matters, and existing personnel; to provide for penalties; to provide for definitions and construction; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for a referendum; to provide effective dates and transitional provisions governing the transfer of various functions and responsibilities from Cobb County to the City of East Cobb; to provide for severability; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
East Cobb, City of; incorporate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #519 (Y: 96 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #499 (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #498 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #467 (Y: 100 N: 63 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #466 (Y: 68 N: 97 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-01-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #462 (Y: 98 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit: Senate Vote #499 (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #498 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #467 (Y: 100 N: 63 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #466 (Y: 68 N: 97 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-01-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #462 (Y: 98 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Effective Date 2022-02-15 | |
2022-02-15 | Act 311 | |
2022-02-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-15 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-14 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-01 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2022-01-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-01-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-01-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-01-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-31 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Hopper |