GA HB839 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a charter for the City of East Dublin, approved April 9, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 4645), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4402), so as to change the corporate limits of the city; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
East Dublin, City of; corporate limits; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #468 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 455 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-26 | House | House Hopper |