GA HB831 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Legislative Retirement System, so as to match the retirement benefit amounts payable to former legislators upon retirement and to currently retired legislators in retirement to those benefits which are payable upon retirement to legislators who are in office on or after January 1, 2022; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Legislative Retirement System; match benefit amounts payable to former legislators to currently retired legislators who are in office on or after January 1, 2022
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-29 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-27 | House | House Hopper |