GA HB830 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to conditionally repeal an Act providing for homestead exemptions from ad valorem taxes for city purposes for residents of the City of Jonesboro, approved May 14, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 5845), and to enact a new provision; to restate the amount of the homestead exemption for the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that city; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, specific conditional repeal, and automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jonesboro, City of; ad valorem tax; restate amount of homestead exemption; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] |
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Darryl Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47746 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/155454 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47746#13890 |