GA HB820 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 12-9-46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to powers and duties of Board of Natural Resources, designation of commissioner or director as board's agent, and power and duties of director, so as to repeal a minimum and maximum allowable fee for motor vehicle emissions inspections; to amend Article 3 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to inspections by officers of Department of Public Safety, so as to repeal such article; to require vehicle equipment inspections; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Natural Resources; repeal a minimum and maximum allowable fee for motor vehicle emissions inspections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-27HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback