GA HB820 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 5 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county boards of tax assessors, so as to establish a procedure for counties following a rejection of a tax digest; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; procedure for counties following a rejection of a tax digest; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] | Rep. Betty Price [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Brad Raffensperger [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #809 (Y: 158 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #631 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #627 (Y: 164 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #631 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #627 (Y: 164 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 346 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |