GA HB813 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Augusta-Richmond County Coliseum Authority, approved April 17, 1973 (Ga. L. 1973, p. 3042), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 23, 1977 (Ga. L. 1977, p. 3300), and an Act approved March 16, 1993 (Ga. L. 1993, p. 4087), so as to change the membership of the Authority; to provide for the terms and appointment of members of the Authority; to provide for qualifications of the members of the Authority; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Augusta-Richmond County Coliseum Authority; membership; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #500 - Supp Local Calendar (Y: 155 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #396 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House Vote #351 - Local Calendar (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 28 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #396 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-03-30 - House - House Vote #351 - Local Calendar (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 28 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-31 | Effective Date | |
2009-05-11 | Act 246 | |
2009-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-03 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-30 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-25 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-23 | House First Readers |