GA HB810 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-14-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to meetings open to the public, limitation on action to contest agency action, recording, notice of time and place, access to minutes, and telecommunications conferences, so as to authorize local workforce development boards and their associated committees and associated local officials organizations and committees to conduct meetings via teleconference; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; local workforce development boards and committees to conduct meetings via teleconference; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |