GA HB808 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to computation of Georgia taxable net income, so as to provide for an exclusion applicable to certain income of certain disabled veterans; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Taxation; exclusion to certain income of certain disabled veterans; provide
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #761 - Passage (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 - Motion To Engross (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #586 - Passage (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #743 - Motion To Engross (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #586 - Passage (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-16 | Act 587 | |
2012-04-16 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Engrossed | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-30 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-26 | House First Readers |