GA HB807 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in the City of St. Marys; to provide for a short title; to provide for the purposes of such districts; to provide for definitions; to provide for boards to administer said districts; to provide for the appointment and election of members of such boards; to provide for taxes, fees, and assessments; to provide for the boundaries of such districts; to provide for bonded indebtedness; to provide for cooperation with local governments; to provide for powers of such boards; to provide for construction; to provide that no notice, proceeding, publication, or referendum shall be required; to provide for dissolution; to provide the procedures connected with all of the foregoing; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of St. Marys Community Improvement Districts Act of 2018; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 342 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |