GA HB807 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating one or more community improvement districts within Clayton County, approved April 7, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 5698), so as to change certain provisions relating to the purpose of the Act; to change the definition of the term "electors"; to change the definition of the term "project"; to change certain provisions relating to taxes, fees, and assessments; to change certain provisions relating to boundaries of such districts; to change certain provisions relating to the powers of boards of such districts; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clayton County; community improvement districts; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #473 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Vote #476 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-31 Effective Date
2016-03-31 Act 318
2016-03-31HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2016-03-28HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2016-02-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2016-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2016-01-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2016-01-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2016-01-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2016-01-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2016-01-25HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-01-22HouseHouse First Readers
2016-01-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback