GA HB807 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-30 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Macon to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Macon, City of; levy an excise tax; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-26 - House - House Vote #335 - Local Calendar (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 31 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-30 Senate Read and Referred
2009-03-26 House Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2009-03-26 House Passed/Adopted
2009-03-26 House Third Readers
2009-03-26 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-03-25 House Second Readers
2009-03-23 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback