GA HB806 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the Town of Riddleville; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the town; to provide for a governing authority of such town and the powers, duties, authority, election, terms, method of filling vacancies, compensation, expenses, qualifications, prohibitions, conflicts of interest, and suspension and removal from office relative to members of such governing authority; to provide for ordinances and codes; to provide for a mayor and a mayor pro tempore and certain duties, powers, and other matters relative thereto; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for severability; to repeal a specific Act; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Riddleville, Town of; provide new charter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #457 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Vote #462 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Vote #462 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Act 369 | |
2014-04-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-01-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House Hopper |