GA HB805 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the office of county treasurer of Terrell County; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Terrell County; office of county treasurer; abolish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #448 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Vote #475 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 341 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |