GA HB80 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Effective Date 2021-02-15
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Effective Date 2021-02-15
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making and providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2020, and ending June 30, 2021, known as the "General Appropriations Act," Act No. 404, approved June 30, 2020, so as to make, provide, and change certain appropriations for the operation of the State government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Supplemental appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2020 - June 30, 2021
Sponsors
Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Motion To Immediately Transmit To The Governor: Senate Vote #36 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #35 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Im Transmit To Gov: House Vote #36 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Agree Sen Sub As Am: House Vote #35 (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #27 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #12 (Y: 149 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Substitute: Senate Vote #35 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Im Transmit To Gov: House Vote #36 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - Agree Sen Sub As Am: House Vote #35 (Y: 165 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #27 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #12 (Y: 149 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Effective Date 2021-02-15 | |
2021-02-15 | Act 2 | |
2021-02-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-02-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-02-11 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-28 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-01-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |