GA HB797 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 31 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to charter schools, so as to revise funding for state chartered special schools; to provide for submittal of charter petitions to the Charter Committee of the State Board of Education; to provide for resubmittal of a charter petition to a local board of education upon expiration of the charter term of a state chartered special school; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State chartered special schools; revise funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #816 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 117 N: 55 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #706 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #705 - Adoption Of Amendment #6 By Senator From The 40th To Committee Sub (Y: 1 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 35th To Committee Sub (Y: 17 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #703 - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By Senator From The 55th To Committee Sub (Y: 15 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #702 - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By Senator From The 38th To Committee Sub (Y: 17 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #701 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 39th To Committee Sub (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #637 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 49 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #706 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #705 - Adoption Of Amendment #6 By Senator From The 40th To Committee Sub (Y: 1 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 - Adoption Of Amendment #5 By Senator From The 35th To Committee Sub (Y: 17 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #703 - Adoption Of Amendment #4 By Senator From The 55th To Committee Sub (Y: 15 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #702 - Adoption Of Amendment #3 By Senator From The 38th To Committee Sub (Y: 17 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #701 - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By Senator From The 39th To Committee Sub (Y: 17 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - House Vote #637 - Passage (Y: 115 N: 49 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2012-05-03 | Act 766 | |
2012-05-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-07 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-26 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-25 | House First Readers |