GA HB792 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waste management, so as to extend the sunset date for certain solid waste surcharges and hazardous waste fees; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waste management; sunset date for certain solid waste surcharges and hazardous waste fees; extend

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #806 (Y: 155 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #804 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #629 (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #515 (Y: 155 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Effective Date
2018-05-03 Act 340
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2018-03-19SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-19SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-31HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback