GA HB792 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to authorize the carrying, possession, and use of electroshock weapons by persons who are students or who are employed at a public institution of postsecondary education; to provide for a definition; to provide for conditions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Firearms; carrying, possession, and use of electroshock weapons by persons who are students or who are employed at a public institution; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. B.J. Pak [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] |
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #848 (Y: 119 N: 50 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #666 (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #593 (Y: 117 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #666 (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Vote #593 (Y: 117 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 616 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-21 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-20 | House | House Hopper |