GA HB788 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Blackshear, approved March 19, 1993 (Ga. L. 1993, p. 4091), as amended, so as to decrease the size of the city council from six to five members; to update provisions relating to elections, meetings, organization, and voting of the city council; to change the description of the council districts; to revise provisions relating to city rules and regulations related to employees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Blackshear, City of; city council; decrease size to five members; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #338 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-05-03 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 324 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House Hopper |