GA HB786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an additional judge of the superior courts of the Flint Judicial Circuit; to provide for the appointment of such additional judge by the Governor; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Superior courts; additional judge of the Flint Judicial Circuit; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] |
Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #786 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #737 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #466 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #737 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Vote #466 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 493 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House Hopper |