GA HB784 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide that certain insurer advertising and promotional items not exceeding $100.00 in value will not be considered an unfair trade practice or an unlawful inducement; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; advertising and promotional items not exceeding $100 will not be considered an unfair trade practice; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #808 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Vote #580 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #638 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Vote #580 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 444 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-21 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-20 | House | House Hopper |