GA HB783 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend various titles of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to repeal provisions creating inactive boards, panels, authorities, centers, commissions, committees, councils, task forces, and other such bodies; to remove inapplicable references; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Administrative procedure; provisions creating inactive boards, panels, authorities and other such bodies; repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] |
Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] | Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #511 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #511 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hopper |