GA HB783 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 27 and Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to game and fish and to waters of the state, ports, and watercraft, respectively, so as to update provisions relating to rules and regulations used to establish criminal violations; to revise provisions relating to the implied consent warning for hunting under the influence cases; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and fish; provisions relating to rules and regulations used to establish criminal violations; update
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] |
Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #745 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Vote #550 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Vote #550 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Act 544 | |
2014-04-21 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-21 | House | House Hopper |