GA HB782 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the continuation of an alternative method of distribution of the net proceeds of the sales and use tax for educational purposes authorized under Article VIII, Section VI, Paragraph IV of the Constitution among the Hall County School District, Gainesville City School District, and Buford City School District; to provide for an effective date, applicability, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Hall County; Gainesville City and Buford City School Districts; provide continuation of an alternative method of distribution of net proceeds of sales and use tax
Sponsors
Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] |
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #567 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Vote #476 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House Vote #476 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Effective Date | |
2016-03-15 | Act 316 | |
2016-03-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-15 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-01-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-20 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-15 | House | House Hopper |