GA HB780 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-16-34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to powers and duties of State Properties Commission generally, so as to allow the commission to use an opinion of value in the valuation of state property where a conveyance of the property by the state is for the sole and direct benefit to the state; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Properties Commission; use an opinion of value in the valuation of state property where a conveyance of the property by the state is for the sole and direct benefit to the state; allow
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #774 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #764 (Y: 1 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #765 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Vote #472 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #764 (Y: 1 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #765 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Vote #472 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 491 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House Hopper |