GA HB78 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Effective Date
Summary
A BILL to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal year beginning July 1, 2011 and ending June 30, 2012.
Title
General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2011 - June 30, 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Rep. Hank Huckaby [R] |
Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Larry O'Neal [R] | Rep. David Ralston [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #309 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #294 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 143 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #225 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Vote #142 - Passage (Y: 132 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Vote #141 - Franklin Am (Y: 4 N: 156 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #294 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 143 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #225 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Vote #142 - Passage (Y: 132 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Vote #141 - Franklin Am (Y: 4 N: 156 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-12 | Act 223 | |
2011-05-12 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-03-31 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-03-31 | House Insists | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Insists | |
2011-03-30 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Transmits House | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-11 | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-03-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-11 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-27 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-26 | House First Readers |