GA HB779 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to crimes and offenses, so as to regulate the use of unmanned aircraft systems and images captured by such systems; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for penalties and a civil right of action; to provide for venue; to amend Code Section 27-3-151 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to activity prohibited in the taking of wildlife, so as to regulate the use of unmanned aircraft systems in connection to hunting and fishing; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; regulate use of unmanned aircraft systems and images; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #751 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #815 (Y: 136 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #636 (Y: 51 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #682 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-03 Veto V8
2016-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2016-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2016-03-24SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2016-03-22HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2016-03-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2016-03-16SenateSenate Third Read
2016-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2016-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2016-03-02SenateSenate Read and Referred
2016-02-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2016-02-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2016-02-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2016-01-21HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-01-20HouseHouse First Readers
2016-01-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback