GA HB777 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-6-165 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to operation of school buses, so as to allow school bus drivers to use cellular telephones in a similar manner as a two-way radio; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
School buses; drivers use cellular telephones in similar manner as a two-way radio; allow
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #614 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Vote #560 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Vote #560 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 443 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-20 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-15 | House | House Hopper |