GA HB775 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 39A of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to real estate appraisers, so as to change certain provisions relating to real estate management companies; to revise and provide for definitions; to provide requirements for the establishment and maintenance of a real estate appraisal management company; to authorize the Georgia Real Estate Appraisers Board to establish certain rules and regulations for appraisal management companies and to collect and remit certain fees; to authorize the board to take disciplinary action against appraisal management companies; to revise certain requirements relating to the board's authority to investigate certain violations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professions and businesses; real estate management companies; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #600 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hopper |