GA HB772 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public assistance, so as to require drug testing for applicants for food stamps; to provide requirements; to provide that any person who fails such drug test shall be ineligible to receive food stamps; to provide for reapplication; to provide for children's food stamps; to provide for confidentiality of records; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public assistance; drug testing for applicants for food stamps; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #726 (Y: 24 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #727 (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #728 (Y: 29 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #729 (Y: 21 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - House Vote #865 (Y: 100 N: 67 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #650 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #702 (Y: 109 N: 64 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Vote #703 (Y: 107 N: 66 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-01 Effective Date
2014-04-29 Act 664
2014-04-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2014-03-27HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2014-03-20HouseHouse Agrees Senate Amend or Sub
2014-03-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2014-03-20SenateSenate Third Read
2014-03-20SenateSenate Taken from Table
2014-03-18SenateSenate Tabled
2014-03-18SenateSenate Engrossed
2014-03-12SenateSenate Read Second Time
2014-03-12SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2014-03-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2014-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2014-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2014-02-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2014-01-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2014-01-21HouseHouse First Readers
2014-01-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20132014/HB/772
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/137639.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/141342.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/142184.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/143107.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/144808.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11712
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11711
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11876
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=12112
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=12011
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=12010
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=12009
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=12008

Bill Comments

feedback