GA HB764 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 8 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to regulation of low THC oil, so as to provide for certain circumstances for the lawful possession or control of certain quantities of low THC oil and marijuana; to amend Chapter 2A of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Department of Public Health, so as to add post traumatic stress disorder to the conditions authorized for the use of low THC oil; to provide for licensing for cultivation of cannabis for the purpose of producing, processing, and dispensing low THC oil in this state; to provide for criteria for certain cultivation and production licenses; to provide for state postsecondary educational institutions to have the option to bid on production facility licenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses; lawful possession of certain quantities of low THC oil and marijuana; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #619 (Y: 145 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-31HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2018-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback