GA HB762 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to offenses against public health and morals, so as to change certain provisions relating to disposal of aborted human fetuses, reporting requirements, penalties, public reports, and confidentiality of identity of physicians filing reports; to provide for reports; to change certain provisions relating to buying, selling, or offering to buy or sell a human body or parts thereof; to amend Article 6 of Chapter 5 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, the "Georgia Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act," so as to change certain provisions relating to limited prohibition on sale or purchase of body parts; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; disposal of aborted human fetuses; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. Jeff Jones [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #548 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hopper |