GA HB757 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to provide for the regulatory powers of cities and counties with certificate of public necessity and convenience or medallion programs; to provide that operation of a taxicab in such jurisdictions without a certificate of public necessity and convenience or medallion is illegal; to provide for identification of taxicab operators; to amend Part 4 of Article 3 of Chapter 1 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ride share network services and transportation referral services, so as to provide definitions; to provide for the regulation of the age of motor vehicles used as taxicabs by certain jurisdictions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; regulatory powers of cities and counties with certificate of public necessity and convenience; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #490 (Y: 150 N: 15 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-29 | House | House Hopper |