GA HB757 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-28 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to protect religious freedoms; to amend Chapter 3 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to marriage generally, so as to provide that religious officials shall not be required to perform marriage ceremonies in violation of their legal right to free exercise of religion; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to selling and other trade practices, so as to change certain provisions relating to days of rest for employees of business and industry; to protect property owners which are religious institutions against infringement of religious freedom; to define a term; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic relations; religious officials shall not be required to perform marriage ceremonies in violation of their legal right; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-16 - House - House Vote #777 (Y: 104 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #649 (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #469 (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #471 (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Vote #529 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28 Veto V1
2016-03-28HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2016-03-28HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2016-03-16SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2016-03-16HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2016-02-19SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2016-02-19SenateSenate Third Read
2016-02-19SenateSenate Engrossed
2016-02-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2016-02-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2016-02-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2016-02-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2016-02-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2016-02-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2016-01-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-01-14HouseHouse First Readers
2016-01-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20152016/HB/757
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20152016/154497.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20152016/157037.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20152016/157324.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20152016/157608.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20152016/160915.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20152016/161054.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=13942
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=13997
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=13995
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14369
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14392

Bill Comments

feedback