GA HB757 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on February 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the board of commissioners for Putnam County, approved September 8, 1879 (Ga. L. 1878-79, p. 334), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 14, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 3639), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Putnam County; board of commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Vote #444 - Local Calendar (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House Vote #444 - Local Calendar (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | Effective Date | |
2012-02-15 | Act 275 | |
2012-02-15 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-02-15 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-01-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-01-31 | House Third Readers | |
2012-01-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-24 | House First Readers |