GA HB752 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Effective Date 2023-04-27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Effective Date 2023-04-27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a homestead exemption from Oconee County ad valorem taxes for the full value of the homestead for residents of that county who are 65 years of age or over and whose gross household income exceeds $40,000.00, approved May 4, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4132), so as to repeal such exemption; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Oconee County; ad valorem tax; repeal a homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #338 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #271 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Effective Date 2023-04-27 | |
2023-04-27 | Act 38 | |
2023-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-20 | House | House Hopper |