GA HB751 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 38 of the O.C.G.A., relating to emergency management, so as to establish the Georgia Emergency Communications Authority; to amend Title 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to revise the Georgia Emergency Telephone Number 9-1-1 Service Act of 1977 to account for the establishment of the authority; to amend Chapter 8 of Title 35, Title 45, and Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to employment and training of peace officers, public officers and employees, and state administrative organization, respectively, so as to make conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Emergency Communications Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #861 (Y: 131 N: 29 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #616 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #493 (Y: 105 N: 57 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #494 (Y: 154 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Vote #616 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #493 (Y: 105 N: 57 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Vote #494 (Y: 154 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-07 | Act 436 | |
2018-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-25 | House | House Hopper |