GA HB749 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-29 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-8-34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to councils of regional commissions, membership, terms of membership, voting, officers, and powers, so as to authorize such councils to meet by teleconference or similar means; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; councils to meet by teleconference or similar means; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] |
Rep. Sam Teasley [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #625 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47380 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/154490 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47380#14116 |