GA HB748 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 44 of the O.C.G.A., relating to regulation of specialized land transactions, so as to provide for protections for homeowners, condominium owners, and property owners in community associations; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to require declarants, developers, or other establishing entities to provide for budgets and reserve account funding for maintenance of community amenities; to implement requirements and procedures for turnover and transition from declarants, developers, or other establishing entities to property owners comprising the community association; to provide for civil causes of action for violations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Association Transparency and Protection Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. J Collins [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52231 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171646 |