GA HB746 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9A of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Woman's Right to Know Act," so as to authorize any female upon whom an abortion is to be performed to decide not to receive or review informational materials regarding an unborn child, certify that she received or reviewed such informational materials, view the fetal image, or hear the fetal heartbeat prior to obtaining an abortion; to provide for documentation of such decision; to provide for limited liability; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Women's Right to Immediate Access Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Park Cannon [D] | Rep. Mable Thomas [D] |
Rep. Renitta Shannon [D] | Rep. Bee Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-14 | House | House Hopper |
2019-12-12 | House | House Prefiled |