GA HB744 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Smyrna, approved August 27, 1931 (Ga. L. 1931, p. 955), as amended, so as to provide for the annexation of certain territory into the boundaries of the city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Smyrna, City of; annexation of certain territory into the boundaries of the city; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Erick Allen [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] |
Rep. Michael Smith [D] | Rep. Mary Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #361 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 84 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House Hopper |